Accounts and annual returns GURU RAVIDASS EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1111617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 February 2022 04 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 19 February 2021 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 19 February 2020 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 19 February 2019 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 19 February 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2018 Not Required