Financial history GURU RAVIDASS EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1111617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/02/2018 19/02/2019 19/02/2020 19/02/2021 19/02/2022
Total gross income £8.93k £22.10k £11.42k £15.51k £7.30k
Total expenditure £13.11k £14.22k £15.42k £13.77k £14.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A