Accounts and annual returns ALOPECIA UK

Charity number: 1111304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window