Financial history AFRICAN EUROPEAN FAMILY NETWORK (AEFAN)

Charity number: 1111421
Charity reporting is overdue by 1493 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £4.00k £50 £150 £0 £0
Total expenditure £3.50k £50 £159 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0