Trustees AFRICAN EUROPEAN FAMILY NETWORK (AEFAN)

Charity number: 1111421
Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rees Seaka Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
Tracy Oppong Annor Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Edwin Owusu Annor Trustee 15 July 2020
None on record
Fouley TRAORE Trustee 27 February 2014
None on record
GASSY TRAORE Trustee 08 July 2012
BLACK BOOKS MATTER UK
Overdue by 169 days