Financial history OXFORD LIEDER

Charity number: 1111458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £458.91k £472.75k £579.42k £505.32k £637.62k
Total expenditure £457.39k £445.59k £514.03k £420.26k £667.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £6.66k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £360.97k £376.25k £400.28k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £218.41k £128.97k £237.33k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £42 £98 £13
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £476.93k £369.04k £601.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £37.10k £51.22k £65.44k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £166.05k £140.03k £148.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0