Trustees ACTIVE LUTON

Charity number: 1111804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nonyelum Alomaja Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Wayne Cullum Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
Philippe Anton Hucklesby Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Priya Chauhan Trustee 22 January 2020
None on record
Emma Kate Knowler Trustee 22 January 2020
None on record
Magadalena Golebiewska Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Ali Haider Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Kevin John Poulton Trustee 11 July 2018
None on record
Femy Annetta Lester Trustee 11 July 2018
None on record
Glynis Yates Trustee 19 October 2016
None on record
MORAG STEWART Trustee 20 April 2016
None on record
John Victor Young Trustee 23 July 2014
None on record
Paul Seath Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record
MARK CATTLE Trustee 28 November 2011
None on record
MAHMOOD HUSSAIN Trustee
THE FILMER TRUST
Received: On time
CLIVE RICHARD MEAD Trustee
None on record