SPORTS AID TRUST

Charity number: 1111612
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 02 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 01 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 01 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 11 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 11 February 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)