SPORTS AID TRUST

Charity number: 1111612
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHELLE MOORE Trustee 19 August 2017
THE RUNNYMEDE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
MR Mike Westcott Chair 25 January 2019 None on record
David Faulkner Trustee 19 January 2015 None on record
Ronald Denholm Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
Richard Paul Glasson Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
IAN BRAID Trustee 27 February 2013 None on record