Financial history THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN & ARBORETUM

Charity number: 1111939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £221.95k £238.99k £192.27k £360.91k £131.46k
Total expenditure £287.82k £233.22k £247.86k £193.95k £119.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A