Accounts and annual returns WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 11 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window