WOODHOUSE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity number: 1112687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 March 2017 On time Download