Accounts and annual returns FIVE TALENTS UK LTD

Charity number: 1113969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window