Financial history Population Matters

Charity number: 1114109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £576.94k £788.94k £515.62k £839.96k £973.98k
Total expenditure £429.06k £515.42k £673.05k £845.60k £987.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £571.27k £782.42k £508.46k £836.10k £970.71k
Income - Other trading activities £848 £1.16k £576 £117 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £421
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.83k £5.36k £6.58k £3.75k £2.86k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £166.79k £437.78k £56.17k £150.67k £122.34k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £350.43k £454.53k £619.64k £756.38k £842.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £78.63k £60.89k £53.41k £89.23k £128.34k
Expenditure - Governance £38.02k £47.95k £65.26k £50.10k £35.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £12.92k £14.91k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £16.27k