Financial history COPLESTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1116694
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £247.92k £107.96k £112.31k £139.13k £185.52k
Total expenditure £234.87k £132.13k £121.55k £142.00k £141.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.60k £31.00k