Trustees COPLESTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1116694
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jason Watson Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
Emily Boxall Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
Nicky Chambers Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Tim Finch Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record
RAE MASCOLL Trustee 08 April 2018
None on record
Angela Bebb Trustee 27 March 2018
None on record
Sean O'Hagan Trustee 25 January 2017
None on record
Rev Edward Collier Trustee 24 May 2013
ST SAVIOUR'S HALL FUND
Received: On time