Financial history BLACKPOOL CARERS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1114558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.40m £1.07m £1.21m £1.20m £1.43m
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.04m £1.14m £1.11m £1.05m
Income from government contracts £276.72k £261.00k £336.00k £336.00k £340.70k
Income from government grants £0 £33.96k £70.77k £59.10k £51.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £593.98k £631.99k £660.92k £626.65k £883.80k
Income - Other trading activities £133.09k £130.24k £163.19k £177.20k £46.85k
Income - Charitable activities £322.74k £302.13k £384.50k £389.19k £497.64k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £900 £924 £1.73k £2.34k £994
Income - Other £350.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £934.86k £966.15k £1.08m £1.04m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £85.37k £72.46k £64.13k £77.12k £5.83k
Expenditure - Governance £13.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0