Trustees BLACKPOOL CARERS CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1114558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Reilly | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Leighton | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jackson | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Howarth | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Topping | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Gilmore | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Sarah Lambert | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY WARD | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.