Accounts and annual returns BLACKPOOL CARERS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1114558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window