Financial history JIGSAW (BURY)

Charity number: 1115643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £156.99k £162.63k £144.33k £121.98k £127.29k
Total expenditure £157.67k £178.02k £151.98k £117.25k £78.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £28.66k £28.66k £28.83k £29.00k
Income from government grants £28.66k £1.73k £4.61k £10.66k N/A