Financial history HEALTHCARE FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £7.65m £7.35m £6.67m £5.76m £7.17m
Total expenditure £7.75m £7.51m £7.41m £5.41m £6.75m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £269.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £188.00k £459.00k £280.00k £174.00k
Income - Other trading activities £5.05m £4.27m £3.48m £2.92m £3.88m
Income - Charitable activities £2.55m £2.79m £2.63m £2.18m £3.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £53.00k £80.00k £72.00k £66.00k £56.00k
Income - Other £0 £16.00k £27.00k £4.00k £6.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.73m £4.17m £4.08m £2.99m £4.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.02m £3.34m £3.33m £2.29m £2.71m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £18.00k £166.00k £20.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £51.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £133.00k £0