Accounts and annual returns OMID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window