THE RESURGENCE TRUST

Charity number: 1120414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time Download