THE RESURGENCE TRUST

Charity number: 1120414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HERBERT GIRARDET Trustee 01 March 2018
ARTISTS' PROJECT EARTH Received: On time
Rowan Mataram Trustee 18 May 2019 None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES SAINSBURY Chair 12 December 2016
THE HEADLEY TRUST Received: On time
THE KAY KENDALL LEUKAEMIA FUND Received: On time
THE TEDWORTH CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE VOICES FOUNDATION Received: On time
STAPLES TRUST
Christabel Reed Trustee 24 January 2019 None on record
RICHARD BAKER Trustee 09 December 2015 None on record
JOSEPHINE YAA AMANKWAH Trustee 12 April 2016 None on record
SANDY BROWN Trustee 07 July 2017 None on record
Ruby Penelope Reed Trustee 24 January 2019 None on record