THE UFTON COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1116659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.45m £1.57m £1.70m £1.89m £1.19m
Total expenditure £1.33m £1.42m £1.53m £1.55m £1.45m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £490.29k £530.07k £551.62k £676.89k £421.56k
Income - Other trading activities £453.23k £471.58k £480.34k £485.37k £155.88k
Income - Charitable activities £502.78k £566.89k £665.93k £721.87k £410.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £183 £91 £597 £1.35k £1.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £201.66k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.14m £1.25m £1.27m £1.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £128.02k £91.37k £100.29k £97.15k £72.26k
Expenditure - Governance £10.46k £10.13k £10.43k £12.88k £11.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £182.13k £181.55k £181.81k £178.28k £161.70k