THE FRIENDS OF PRIORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1116198
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 March 2017 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required