THE FRIENDS OF PRIORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1116198
Charity reporting is overdue by 330 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £4.67k £8.26k £3.33k £5.97k £10.96k
Total expenditure £4.77k £2.59k £6.60k £3.70k £7.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A