THE FRIENDS OF PRIORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1116198
Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lawrence Christopher Chapman Trustee 17 September 2014
OULTON BROAD WATER SPORTS CENTRE Recently registered
MAUREEN HORSFALL Trustee 13 May 2013 None on record
CHARLOTTE EMMA GILLESPY Trustee 16 May 2012 None on record
CANON HENRY MALCOLM FORD Chair None on record
Diana McGaley Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
Sharon Reynolds Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record