Financial history EMPOWER - THE EMERGING MARKETS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1118916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £2.88m £2.13m £4.01m £3.92m £5.38m
Total expenditure £2.60m £1.80m £3.24m £4.25m £3.89m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.74m £993.56k £2.02m £1.73m £5.38m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.14m £1.99m £2.19m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54 £0 £512 £751 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.38m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.60m £1.80m £3.05m £3.92m £3.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £189.62k £327.26k £87.30k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £1.80m £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £1.92m £2.11m £2.17m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0