Accounts and annual returns LONDON JEWISH FORUM

Charity number: 1119590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 11 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 13 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 06 January 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required