Financial history LONDON JEWISH FORUM

Charity number: 1119590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £2.00k £0 £0 £0 £500
Total expenditure £1.38k £3.48k £1.52k £1.48k £7.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A