THE FOUNDATION OF THE COLLEGE OF ST GEORGE WINDSOR CASTLE

Charity number: 1118295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £577.85k £231.41k £337.90k £290.13k £839.04k
Total expenditure £490.51k £2.50m £193.58k £443.78k £868.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £527.63k N/A N/A N/A £830.18k
Income - Other trading activities £46.82k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £3.40k N/A N/A N/A £2.97k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.89k
Income - Legacies £127.69k N/A N/A N/A £715.77k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £344.30k N/A N/A N/A £861.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds £146.21k N/A N/A N/A £6.87k
Expenditure - Governance £6.42k N/A N/A N/A £21.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £337.88k N/A N/A N/A £840.48k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £255
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0