THE FOUNDATION OF THE COLLEGE OF ST GEORGE WINDSOR CASTLE

Charity number: 1118295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL GARTH MCKEONE Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
CHRISTOPHER GRANT AITKEN Trustee 02 April 2018
ST. GEORGE'S HOUSE TRUST (WINDSOR CASTLE) Received: On time
THE WINDSOR AND ETON SOCIETY INCORPORATING WINDSOR HERITAGE Received: On time
WINDSOR AND ETON CHORAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE WINDSOR BENEFIT TRUST Received: On time
THAMES HOSPICE Received: On time
THE PRINCE PHILIP TRUST FUND Received: On time
Sir John Damien Spurling KCVO OBE Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
THE RIGHT REVEREND DAVID JOHN CONNER KCVO Chair
ST. GEORGE'S HOUSE TRUST (WINDSOR CASTLE) Received: On time
THE MILITARY KNIGHTS OF WINDSOR WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND SUPERNUMARY KNIGHTS BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
MILITARY KNIGHTS OF WINDSOR CHARITY Received: 8 days late
ST GEORGE'S SCHOOL WINDSOR CASTLE Overdue by 35 days
Dr Stella Dragomirova Panayotova Trustee 23 March 2021 None on record
ADMIRAL SIR JAMES PEROWNE KBE Trustee 05 November 2015
THE MILITARY KNIGHTS OF WINDSOR WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND SUPERNUMARY KNIGHTS BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
MILITARY KNIGHTS OF WINDSOR CHARITY Received: 8 days late
THE PRINCE PHILIP TRUST FUND Received: On time
BRITISH FORCES FOUNDATION Received: On time