ST HILDA'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1137537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £10.34m £10.49m £10.43m £10.74m £10.94m
Total expenditure £8.69m £9.22m £9.28m £10.60m £8.51m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.50m £1.64m £1.90m £1.97m £3.29m
Income - Other trading activities £324.00k £299.00k £281.00k £210.00k £104.00k
Income - Charitable activities £5.52m £5.68m £5.45m £5.79m £4.91m
Income - Endowments £9.00k £8.00k £19.00k £5.00k £8.00k
Income - Investment £2.00m £2.87m £2.80m £2.77m £2.43m
Income - Other £0 £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £209.00k
Income - Legacies £934.00k £0 £830.00k £474.00k £2.12m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.84m £8.37m £8.36m £9.71m £7.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £626.00k £850.00k £765.00k £744.00k £703.00k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £11.00k £18.00k £20.00k £18.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £179.00k £311.00k £300.00k £275.00k £266.00k
Expenditure - Other £226.00k £0 £159.00k £141.00k £74.00k