ST HILDA'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1137537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

41 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Louise Hanson Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Dr Matthew Parrott Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
DR Anders Bredahl Kock Trustee 31 August 2017 None on record
Dr PHILIPPA ANNE HULLEY Trustee 29 August 2012 None on record
Dr REBECCA MARGARET ARMSTRONG Trustee None on record
Professor PETRA SCHLEITER Trustee None on record
Dr DMITRY FILATOV Trustee None on record
Professor Duncan Richards Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Dr GEORGINA LOUISE BRENTNALL PAUL Trustee None on record
DR Lorraine Wild Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR JULIA ALISON NOBLE OBE FREng MA DPhil CEng FIET Trustee 15 December 2011
THE OXFORD TRUST Received: On time
Dr Barbara Havelkova Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Dr STEPHEN BENEDICT MCHUGH Trustee 15 December 2011 None on record
Professor IRENE MARGARET MOROZ Trustee None on record
Dr KATHERINE JANE CLARKE Trustee None on record
Professor FIONA MACINTOSH Trustee
GILBERT MURRAY TRUST Received: On time
Dr Claire Gwenlan Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Dr Catherine Elizabeth Swales Trustee 09 March 2016 None on record
Dr RACHEL CONDRY Trustee 15 December 2011 None on record
Professor SUSAN JONES Trustee None on record
Dr LORNA JOYCE SMITH Trustee None on record
Professor Jane Barlow Trustee 01 October 2016
ASSOCIATION FOR INFANT MENTAL HEALTH (UK) Received: 53 days late
Dr David Tew Trustee 01 February 2020 None on record
Dr ELINOR PAYNE Trustee 16 December 2011 None on record
Dr MAIKE GLITSCH Trustee None on record
Dr KERSTIN HOGE Trustee None on record
Dr ARIS KATZOURAKIS Trustee 15 December 2011 None on record
BRONWYN MILNER TRAVERS Trustee None on record
DR Sarah Jane Norman Trustee 15 February 2017 None on record
Dr DAVID ALASTAIR HOWEY Trustee 15 December 2011 None on record
Dr HELEN JANE SWIFT Trustee 15 December 2011
SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF MEDIEVAL LANGUAGES AND LITERATURE Received: On time
Professor SELINA TODD Trustee 15 December 2011 None on record
Dr Daniel Peter Bulte Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR DANIEL LESLIE WAKELIN Trustee 15 December 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR JULIA MARY YEOMANS MA, D.PHIL Trustee None on record
Dr MARGARET KEAN Trustee None on record
Dr HANNAH ELIZABETH SMITH Trustee None on record
DR Dev Saif Gangjee Trustee 14 October 2013
THE MODERN LAW REVIEW LIMITED Received: On time
Dr Andrea Mondino Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Professor Sir Gordon Duff Chair 01 August 2014
JACQUELINE DU PRE MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
Christopher Wood Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record