SOMALI CULTURAL RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1120160
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 November 2019 07 December 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 07 December 2020 68 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 14 December 2018 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2018 75 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required