ALDERMAN SAMUEL WILSON FUND

Charity number: 1117548
Charity reporting is overdue by 125 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 19 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 26 July 2019 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 18 April 2018 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 20 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required