ALDERMAN SAMUEL WILSON FUND

Charity number: 1117548
Charity reporting is overdue by 125 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL HUDSON Trustee 27 April 2017
RICHARD REEVE'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 125 days
Christopher Philip Robinson Trustee 08 December 2016
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 125 days
ALDERMAN IAN DAVID LUDER Chair
COOPERS CHARITY CIO Received: On time
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 125 days
JEREMY LEWIS SIMONS OBE, MSc Trustee 27 February 2014
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE TREE COUNCIL Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE THE IRISH SOCIETY Received: On time
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 125 days
HOUSING THE HOMELESS CENTRAL FUND Received: On time
THE VENERABLE LUKE JONATHAN MILLER MA Trustee 21 April 2016
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF MARY Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND Received: On time
THE GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST KATHARINE CREE, DIOCESE OF LONDON Received: On time
THE BISHOPSGATE FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW BY THE WARDROBE, LONDON Received: On time
STATIONERS' HALL CHARITY Received: On time
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 125 days
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CLERGY STIPEND TRUST Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS Received: On time
DEPUTY CATHERINE SIDONY MCGUINNESS Trustee
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 125 days
Alan Robert Bird MA Cantab Trustee 06 July 2018
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 125 days