THE NEW CROSS GATE TRUST

Charity number: 1118010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £288.35k £284.58k £382.18k £393.86k £385.36k
Total expenditure £266.89k £284.98k £334.64k £359.54k £400.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.17k £11.94k £5.05k £27.04k £1.01k