THE NEW CROSS GATE TRUST

Charity number: 1118010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rochelle Abigail Lian Martine Saunders Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
Helen Mathie Chair 27 May 2015 None on record
Joanna Walker Trustee 21 November 2019 None on record
Laura Wirtz Trustee 15 July 2015 None on record
Wendy Braithwaite Trustee 15 July 2015 None on record
Katie Helen Overton Trustee 25 January 2021 None on record
IMOGEN SLATER Trustee 23 September 2016 None on record
Janet Bygrave Trustee 27 February 2020 None on record
Joan Millbank Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
JOHN LUMLEY Trustee None on record
Cathy Druce Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
Matthew Gerry Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
Andrew Philip ROTHERY Trustee 01 March 2017
DEPTFORD FIRST Received: On time
Dr PAMELA MARTIN Trustee 24 May 2011 None on record