VINCENT'S APPEAL TRUST COMPANY

Charity number: 1117802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £144.35k £208.00k £208.19k £490.27k £236.62k
Total expenditure £108.76k £114.20k £135.92k £237.51k £129.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A