Financial history THE ORIENTEERING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1118793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £19.59k £16.83k £16.11k £27.04k £31.28k
Total expenditure £14.47k £12.73k £7.37k £4.08k £17.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A