THE ORIENTEERING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1118793
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Derek Ward Trustee 19 March 2020 None on record
Duncan Archer Trustee 09 February 2015 None on record
NEIL CAMERON Trustee 29 September 2013 None on record
DR ROGER SCRUTTON BSC.PHD Trustee 03 May 2018 None on record
Andrew Evans Trustee 14 September 2015 None on record
PAULINE OLIVANT Trustee 28 March 2013 None on record