VOCES CANTABILES MUSIC LIMITED

Charity number: 1126785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £767.05k £877.12k £998.15k £1.34m £1.18m
Total expenditure £719.88k £881.37k £935.37k £1.22m £1.16m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £63.32k £0 £15.00k £13.50k £128.91k
Income - Donations and legacies £114.92k £139.34k £123.23k £114.94k £219.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £652.13k £737.78k £874.87k £1.22m £832.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £128.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £719.88k £881.37k £935.37k £1.22m £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.27k £7.79k £7.49k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0