THE GLOBAL FUND FOR CHILDREN UK TRUST

Charity number: 1119544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michel Antakly Trustee 22 February 2016 None on record
Mandy DeFilippo Trustee 18 September 2018
THE MONTEVERDI CHOIR AND ORCHESTRAS LIMITED Received: On time
Manju Lulla Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Mark Wilson Chair 27 July 2021 None on record
John Hecklinger Trustee 16 October 2017 None on record
Antoine deGuillenchmidt Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Marine Abiad Trustee 27 July 2021 None on record
Nicholas Antonas Trustee 28 July 2020 None on record