Accounts and annual returns THE TEES VALLEY, DURHAM AND NORTH YORKSHIRE NEUROLOGICAL ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1119043
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 February 2022 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required