Trustees THE TEES VALLEY, DURHAM AND NORTH YORKSHIRE NEUROLOGICAL ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1119043
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID MUDD Chair 20 January 2013
None on record
Nikita Shepherdson Trustee 29 July 2021
None on record
Diane Williams Trustee 19 April 2018
None on record
Eric Charlton Trustee 15 March 2018
None on record
Gordon Williams Trustee 16 April 2015
None on record
Christine Harling Trustee 15 December 2014
None on record
ANDREW LEWIS Trustee 11 January 2013
None on record
VERONA BUTLER Trustee 11 January 2013
None on record
STEPHANIE KILINC Trustee
None on record