Financial history THE TEES VALLEY, DURHAM AND NORTH YORKSHIRE NEUROLOGICAL ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1119043
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.81k £14.13k £16.20k £16.33k £32.72k
Total expenditure £20.81k £14.13k £16.20k £16.33k £32.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £5.00k £10.00k £5.00k