Financial history UK Music Masters Ltd.

Charity number: 1119372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £865.21k £920.28k £1.01m £1.17m £1.08m
Total expenditure £843.68k £960.67k £938.74k £1.07m £1.09m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £638.97k £717.75k £777.48k £934.64k £843.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £224.35k £201.92k £230.76k £229.95k £235.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.89k £608 £1.21k £548 £115
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £715.46k £810.82k £775.37k £832.40k £858.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £128.22k £149.85k £163.37k £236.47k £231.18k
Expenditure - Governance £5.35k £6.19k £7.14k £7.52k £11.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0