THE ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1120168
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £53.23k £55.48k £63.12k £86.69k £77.31k
Total expenditure £49.84k £55.96k £57.10k £62.36k £69.69k
Income from government contracts £42.76k £43.22k £0 £76.09k £54.50k
Income from government grants £250 £0 £0 N/A N/A